OR HCR6 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes and honors Lance Corporal Dale G. Peterson (1986-2007) for his service to his country.
Title
Recognizing and honoring Lance Corporal Dale G. Peterson (1986-2007) for his service to his country.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Special Order (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Special Order (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Ferrioli. Adopted.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Olsen, Steiner Hayward. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Made a Special Order of Business by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-02 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Bentz. Adopted.Ayes, 60. |
2017-02-15 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on March 2, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2017-02-09 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |