OR HCR6 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reaffirms woman's right to make reproductive decisions.
Title
Reaffirming woman's right to make reproductive decisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-01 | House | Informational Meeting scheduled. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |