OR HCR4 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes and honors Oregon State Police Trooper Burrell Milo Baucom (1902-1933) for his service to this state. Recognizes and honors Oregon State Police Trooper Burrell Milo Baucom (1902-1933) for his service to this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing and honoring Oregon State Police Trooper Burrell Milo Baucom for his service to this state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-17HouseFiled with Secretary of State.
2021-06-16SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-08SenateFinal reading. Carried by Girod. Adopted. Ayes, 27; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Johnson, Steiner Hayward.
2021-06-07SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-07SenateRecommendation: Do adopt.
2021-05-06SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2021-04-29SenateReferred to Rules.
2021-04-28SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-04-27HouseRead. Carried by Morgan. Adopted. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Hudson, Leif, Nearman, Smith G.
2021-04-27HouseRead. Carried by <>. Adopted.
2021-04-26HouseRecommendation: Be adopted.
2021-04-20HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Rules.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback