OR HCR38 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes limitations and deadlines for legislative measures for 2020 regular session of Eightieth Legislative Assembly.
Title
Establishing limitations and deadlines for legislative measures for the 2020 regular session of the Eightieth Legislative Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Final reading. Carried by Baertschiger Jr. Adopted. Ayes, 20; Nays, 7--Bentz, Boles, Boquist, Heard, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Gelser. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-26 | House | Read. Carried by Holvey. Adopted. Ayes, 33; Nays, 22--Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Witt, Zika; Absent, 1--Smith Warner; Excused, 4--Barreto, Clem, Hernandez, Reardon. |
2019-06-25 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2019-06-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-20 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2019-06-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |