OR HCR35 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honors teacher and coach Bobbie Steninger of Lakeview, Oregon.
Title
Honoring teacher and coach Bobbie Steninger of Lakeview, Oregon.
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Whitsett [R] | Sen. Cliff Bentz [R] | Rep. Mike McLane [R] | Sen. Ted Ferrioli [R] |
Sen. Douglas Whitsett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Whitsett. Adopted. Ayes, 30. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-19 | House | Read. Carried by Whitsett. Adopted. Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Fagan, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Dembrow, Speaker Kotek. |
2013-06-18 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on June 19, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-17 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-06-13 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-06-05 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-06-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |