OR HCR32 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Public Hearing and Possible Work Session scheduled.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Hearing: Apr 22 @ 1:00 pm in HR C
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

In memoriam: Former Speaker of the House of Representatives and state Senator Grattan Kerans, 1941-2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In memoriam: Former Speaker of the House of Representatives and state Senator Grattan Kerans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House Special Order (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenatePublic Hearing and Possible Work Session scheduled.
2019-04-05SenateReferred to Rules.
2019-04-04SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-04-03HouseRead as Special Order of Business. Carried by Holvey. Adopted. Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Keny-Guyer; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Smith G, Smith Warner.
2019-03-28HouseRules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on April 3, 2019 Calendar.
2019-03-26HouseRecommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-03-25HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Rules.
2019-03-04HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback