OR HCR32 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing and honoring Oregon State Police Trooper Dan A. Nelson (1948-1972) for his service to this state.
Title
Recognizing and honoring Oregon State Police Trooper Dan A. Nelson (1948-1972) for his service to this state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Filed with Secretary of State. | |
2011-06-27 | President signed. | |
2011-06-24 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-21 | Final reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Adopted. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Boquist, Verger. | |
2011-06-20 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-20 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2011-06-16 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-06-08 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-06-07 | Read. Carried by Krieger, Olson. Adopted. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Berger. | |
2011-05-24 | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on June 7, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-05-16 | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-05-12 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2011-05-09 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-04-12 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |