OR HCR31 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes and honors Chief John Joseph Brazil (1944-2018) for his service to this state.
Title
Recognizing and honoring Chief John Joseph Brazil for his service to this state.
Sponsors
Sen. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Special Order (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Special Order (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Olsen. Adopted. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Taken from 05-13 Calendar and placed on 05-14 Calendar by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Taken from 05-06 Calendar and placed on 05-09 Calendar on voice vote. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-04 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Smith DB. Adopted. Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Keny-Guyer, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Smith Warner, Williamson. |
2019-03-28 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on April 4, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-03-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 28, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2019-03-25 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |