OR HCR3 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes and honors Private James Herbert Rowden (1944-1966) and Private First Class John Wayne Rowden (1946-1968) for their service to their country.
Title
Recognizing and honoring Private James Herbert Rowden and Private First Class John Wayne Rowden for their service to their country.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Boquist. Adopted.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Olsen, Steiner Hayward. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-02-09 | House | Read. Carried by Esquivel. Adopted.Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Boone, Clem. |
2017-02-07 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2017-02-02 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |