OR HCR28 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies Legislative Branch Personnel Rule 27 to adopt policies and definitions that conform with recently enacted state law requirements. Prohibits Senate and House Committees on Conduct from meeting using virtual or electronic means. Requires Senate and House Committees on Conduct to meet in person at Capitol on weekdays during specified hours.] Modifies Legislative Branch Personnel Rule 27 to adopt policies and definitions that conform with recently enacted state law requirements. Authorizes Legislative Equity Officer to hire employee of Legislative Equity Office to perform investigations under Rule 27. Allows interim safety measures to be applied to respondent, complainant or impacted party within specified limitations. Directs Senate and House of Representatives to determine cochairpersons of Senate and House conduct committees when committee membership is determined.
Title
Amending Legislative Branch Personnel Rule 27 and adopting Legislative Branch Personnel Rule 27-B.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 45 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to adoption and be referred to Conduct (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 45 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to adoption and be referred to Conduct (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Final reading. Carried by Prozanski. Adopted. Ayes, 21; Nays, 7--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt the A-Eng. resolution. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-14 | House | Read. Carried by Fahey, Noble. Adopted. Ayes, 45; Nays, 11--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Leif, Morgan, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G; Excused, 3--Hayden, Lewis, Valderrama. |
2021-06-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 14, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-07 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-06-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-08 | House | Referred to Conduct by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-08 | House | Without recommendation as to adoption and be referred to Conduct. |
2021-04-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to Conduct. |
2021-03-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |