OR HCR27 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Portland Thorns Football Club for its achievements.
Title
Commending Portland Thorns Football Club for its achievements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Special Order (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Special Order (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-31 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Taylor. Adopted. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-05-02 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Piluso, Smith Warner. Adopted. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barker, Lewis, Sprenger. |
2019-03-28 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on May 2, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-03-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 28, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-03-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 27, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-03-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 26, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-03-21 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2019-03-20 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |