OR HCR27 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes and honors Corporal Jessica A. Ellis (1983-2008) for her service to her country.
Title
Recognizing and honoring Corporal Jessica A. Ellis for her service to her country.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Special Order (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Special Order (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Olsen. Adopted.Ayes, 30. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Taken from 05-31 Calendar and placed on 06-01 Calendar on voice vote. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-24 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Reschke. Adopted.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boone, Smith G. |
2017-04-20 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on April 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2017-04-13 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-17 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2017-03-16 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |