OR HCR27 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-16)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-16)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
In memoriam: David B. Frohnmayer, 1940-2015.
Title
In memoriam: David B. Frohnmayer, 1940-2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Beyer. Adopted.Ayes, 30. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Made a Special Order of Business by unanimous consent. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-30 | House | Read. Carried by Hoyle, Gilliam. Adopted.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Nathanson. |
2015-04-28 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on April 30, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-04-24 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2015-04-20 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2015-04-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |