OR HCR27 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing and honoring Oregon State Police Senior Trooper Maria F. Mignano (1962-2001) for her service to this state.
Title
Recognizing and honoring Oregon State Police Senior Trooper Maria F. Mignano (1962-2001) for her service to this state.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Olson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Filed with Secretary of State. | |
2011-06-23 | President signed. | |
2011-06-22 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-15 | Final reading. Carried by Morse. Adopted. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Dingfelder. | |
2011-06-14 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-14 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2011-06-09 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-06-03 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-06-02 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-06-01 | Read. Carried by Olson. Adopted. Ayes, 60. | |
2011-05-24 | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on June 1, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-05-16 | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-05-12 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2011-05-09 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-04-12 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |