OR HCR26 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes and honors Private First Class Thomas L. Tucker (1981-2006) for his service to his country.
Title
Recognizing and honoring Private First Class Thomas L. Tucker for his service to his country.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Special Order (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Special Order (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Ferrioli. Adopted.Ayes, 30. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Taken from 05-31 Calendar and placed on 06-01 Calendar on voice vote. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-20 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Huffman. Adopted.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Holvey, Lininger. |
2017-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on April 20, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2017-04-06 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2017-03-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |