OR HCR25 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating IBM on occasion of its centennial.
Title
Commemorating IBM on occasion of its centennial.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | Filed with Secretary of State. | |
2011-06-20 | President signed. | |
2011-06-17 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-13 | Final reading. Carried by Beyer. Adopted. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-06-10 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-10 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2011-06-07 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-05-23 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-05-23 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-05-19 | Read. Carried by Berger. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Nays, 2--Harker, Schaufler. | |
2011-05-18 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2011-05-16 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-04-12 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |