OR HCR24 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

In memoriam: Leonard Jules "Len" Bergstein, 1945-2022. In memoriam: Leonard Jules "Len" Bergstein, 1945-2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In memoriam: Leonard Jules "Len" Bergstein.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Special Order (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Motion to Change Calendar (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Special Order (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-03HouseFiled with Secretary of State.
2023-05-03SenatePresident signed.
2023-05-02HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-04-26SenateFinal reading. Carried by Steiner. Adopted. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Prozanski.
2023-04-26SenateMade a Special Order of Business. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Gorsek, Prozanski, Sollman.
2023-04-24SenateTaken from 04-24 Calendar and placed on 04-26 Calendar. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
2023-04-20SenateCarried over to 04-24 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-19SenateCarried over to 04-20 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-18SenateCarried over to 04-19 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-17SenateCarried over to 04-18 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-13SenateCarried over to 04-17 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-12SenateCarried over to 04-13 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-11SenateCarried over to 04-12 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-10SenateCarried over to 04-11 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-06SenateCarried over to 04-10 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-05SenateCarried over to 04-06 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-04SenateCarried over to 04-05 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-03SenateSecond reading.
2023-04-03SenateRecommendation: Do adopt.
2023-03-28SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2023-03-20SenateReferred to Rules.
2023-03-15SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2023-03-14HouseRead as Special Order of Business. Carried by Reynolds. Adopted. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Javadi, Scharf; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Pham H.
2023-03-14HouseRules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on 03-14 Calendar.
2023-03-13HouseRecommendation: Be adopted.
2023-03-09HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2023-03-03HouseReferred to Rules.
2023-02-28HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HCR24
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HCR24/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HCR24/Enrolled
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75143
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74930
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75138
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75483
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76837
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264200
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/263394
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268014
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267131
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267132
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267133
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34511
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=561737
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34869
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=575398
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=575805
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=575820

Bill Comments

feedback