OR HCR24 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-13)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Work Session scheduled.
Pending: Senate Energy and Environment Committee
Hearing: May 18 @ 1:00 pm in Remote B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Commemorates 50th anniversary of Oregon Bottle Bill. Commemorates 50th anniversary of Oregon Bottle Bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commemorating 50th anniversary of Oregon Bottle Bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18SenateWork Session scheduled.
2021-05-11SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-23SenateReferred to Energy and Environment.
2021-04-21SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-04-19HouseRead. Carried by Sollman. Adopted. Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Leif, Levy, Nearman.
2021-04-16HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 19, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-15HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 16, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-14HouseCarried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-13HouseCarried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-12HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-10HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-09HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-08HouseCarried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-06HouseCarried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-05HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar.
2021-03-31HouseCarried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-30HouseCarried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-29HouseRecommendation: Be adopted.
2021-03-24HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Energy and Environment.
2021-03-02HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback