OR HCR23 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honors John Shilts for his years of service to State of Oregon.
Title
Honoring John Shilts for his years of service to the State of Oregon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - House - House Special Order (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-12 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Nosse. Adopted.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boone, Lewis. |
2017-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on April 12, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-06 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-03-30 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |