OR HCR21 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes deadlines for completion of legislative measures for 2021 regular session of Eighty-first Legislative Assembly. Establishes deadlines for completion of legislative measures for 2021 regular session of Eighty-first Legislative Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing deadlines for completion of legislative measures for 2021 regular session of Eighty-first Legislative Assembly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - House - House Resolution Adopted (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27HouseFiled with Secretary of State.
2021-01-22SenatePresident signed.
2021-01-21HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-01-11HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Wilde.
2021-01-11SenateFinal reading. Carried by Dembrow. Adopted. Ayes, 23; Excused, 6--Boquist, Heard, Johnson, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher, Thomsen.
2021-01-11HouseResolution adopted in conjunction with the 2021 Rules of the House. Ayes, 35; Nays, 25--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Hernandez, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Nearman, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wilde, Wright, Zika.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback