OR HCR21 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes and honors Chief Michael Duyck for his service to Tualatin Valley Fire & Rescue and State of Oregon.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing and honoring Chief Michael Duyck for his service to Tualatin Valley Fire & Rescue and State of Oregon.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Special Order (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseFiled with Secretary of State.
2019-04-24SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-23HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-22SenateFinal reading. Carried by Boquist. Adopted. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Hansell, Linthicum, Winters.
2019-04-18SenateSecond reading.
2019-04-18SenateRecommendation: Be adopted.
2019-04-17SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-03-26SenateReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2019-03-26SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-03-25HouseRead as Special Order of Business. Carried by Doherty. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Clem, Wilde.
2019-03-21HouseRecommendation: Be adopted.
2019-03-18HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Rules.
2019-02-18HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback