OR HCR201 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commends Paul Warner for exemplary service as Legislative Revenue Officer and extends well wishes to him upon his retirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending Paul Warner for exemplary service as Legislative Revenue Officer and extending well wishes to him upon his retirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Special Order (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22HouseFiled with Secretary of State.
2018-02-22SenatePresident signed.
2018-02-22HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-02-20SenateFinal reading. Carried by Hass. Adopted. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Kruse, Riley.
2018-02-19SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-19SenateRecommendation: Be adopted.
2018-02-15SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Rules.
2018-02-14SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-13HouseRead as Special Order of Business. Carried by Barnhart. Adopted. Ayes, 60.
2018-02-08HouseRules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on February 13, 2018 Calendar.
2018-02-07HouseRecommendation: Be adopted.
2018-02-06HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Rules.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback