OR HCR20 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-5)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-5)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Honors civic leader, author, journalist and entrepreneur Gerald "Gerry" Frank.
Title
Honoring civic leader, author, journalist and entrepreneur Gerald "Gerry" Frank.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Winters. Adopted.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Burdick. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Taken from 05-13 Calendar and placed on 05-19 Calendar on voice vote. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-21 | House | Read. Carried by Hack, Gilliam. Adopted.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Evans, Gorsek. |
2015-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on April 21, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-04-08 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2015-04-06 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2015-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |