OR HCR20 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Honors Alice Richmond for contributions to community.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honoring Alice Richmond for contributions to community.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-21HouseFiled with Secretary of State.
2013-06-21SenatePresident signed.
2013-06-21HouseSpeaker signed.
2013-06-19SenateFinal reading. Carried by Devlin. Adopted. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Johnson.
2013-06-19SenateMade a Special Order of Business by voice vote.
2013-06-18SenateTaken from 06-18 Calendar and placed on 06-19 Calendar on voice vote.
2013-06-17SenateCarried over to 06-18 by unanimous consent.
2013-06-13SenateSecond reading.
2013-06-13SenateRecommendation: Be adopted.
2013-06-04SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2013-05-22SenateReferred to Rules.
2013-05-22SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2013-05-21HouseRead. Carried by Parrish. Adopted. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Kennemer.
2013-04-11HouseRules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on May 21, 2013 Calendar.
2013-04-09HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 11, 2013 Calendar.
2013-04-05HouseRecommendation: Be adopted.
2013-04-03HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2013-03-04HouseReferred to Rules.
2013-02-25HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback