OR HCR2 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes and honors Chief Daniel K. Duncan (1955-2010) for his service to this state.
Title
Recognizing and honoring Chief Daniel K. Duncan (1955-2010) for his service to this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Special Order (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Special Order (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Devlin. Adopted.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Boquist, Monroe, Olsen. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Made a Special Order of Business by unanimous consent. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Taken from 04-27 Calendar and placed on 05-04 Calendar on voice vote. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-27 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Lininger. Adopted.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Smith G. |
2017-02-23 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on March 27, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-02-22 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2017-02-16 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |