OR HCR18 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes importance of civic education and commends Classroom Law Project for 40 years of service in providing interactive civic education programs. Recognizes importance of civic education and commends Classroom Law Project for 40 years of service in providing interactive civic education programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing importance of civic education and commending Classroom Law Project for 40 years of service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Special Order (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01HouseFiled with Secretary of State.
2023-04-27SenatePresident signed.
2023-04-26HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-04-24SenateFinal reading. Carried by Lieber. Adopted. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
2023-04-20SenateCarried over to 04-24 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-19SenateCarried over to 04-20 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-18SenateCarried over to 04-19 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-17SenateCarried over to 04-18 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-13SenateCarried over to 04-17 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-12SenateCarried over to 04-13 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-11SenateCarried over to 04-12 by unanimous consent.
2023-04-10SenateSecond reading.
2023-04-10SenateRecommendation: Do adopt.
2023-04-04SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2023-03-24SenateReferred to Rules.
2023-03-23SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2023-03-22HouseRead as Special Order of Business. Carried by Evans. Adopted. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Goodwin, Levy E, Reschke, Smith G.
2023-03-22HouseRules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on 03-22 Calendar.
2023-03-21HouseRecommendation: Be adopted.
2023-03-14HouseWork Session held.
2023-03-09HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-03-03HouseReferred to Rules.
2023-02-28HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HCR18
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HCR18/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HCR18/Enrolled
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75398
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74736
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75417
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75727
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264194
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/263401
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264770
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269134
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269135
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269136
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269977
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77775
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34595
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=565515
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35145
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=575401

Bill Comments

feedback