OR HCR17 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Honors 2014 Southern Oregon University Raiders football team for their first-ever National Association of Intercollegiate Athletics Football National Championship.
Title
Honoring Southern Oregon University Raiders football team for National Association of Intercollegiate Athletics championship.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Buckley [D] | Rep. Sal Esquivel [R] | Sen. Alan Bates [D] | Sen. Herman Baertschiger [R] |
Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Rep. Wayne Krieger [R] | Rep. Duane Stark [R] | Rep. Carl Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Baertschiger Jr. Adopted.Ayes, 30. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-21 | House | Read. Carried by Buckley. Adopted.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Evans, Gorsek. |
2015-04-14 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on April 21, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2015-04-08 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Higher Education, Innovation, and Workforce Development. |
2015-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |