OR HCR12 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Work Session held.
Pending: Senate Veterans and Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes and honors Medal of Honor recipient Specialist Four Larry Gilbert Dahl (1949-1971) for his service to his country. Recognizes and honors Medal of Honor recipient Specialist Four Larry Gilbert Dahl (1949-1971) for his service to his country.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing and honoring Medal of Honor recipient Specialist Four Larry Gilbert Dahl for his service to his country.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11SenateWork Session held.
2021-05-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-29SenateReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2021-04-28SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-04-28HouseRead. Carried by Drazan. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Evans, Nearman.
2021-04-27HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 28, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-26HouseRecommendation: Be adopted.
2021-04-20HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Rules.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback