OR HCR11 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-05 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-05 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commends Brigadier General Julie A. Bentz on being first female officer in history of Oregon Army National Guard to achieve rank of Brigadier General.
Title
Commending Brigadier General Julie A. Bentz on being first female officer in history of Oregon Army National Guard to achieve rank of Brigadier General.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-05 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Boquist. Adopted. Ayes, 30. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-03-06 | House | Read. Carried by Bentz. Adopted. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Clem, Matthews, McKeown, Olson. |
2013-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on March 6, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-02-28 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-02-15 | House | Referred to Veterans' Services and Emergency Preparedness. |
2013-02-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |