OR HB5221 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-01 - Chapter 8, (2020 Laws): Effective date September 20, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies amounts of lottery funds allocated from Administrative Services Economic Development Fund to state agencies. Modifies amounts of lottery funds allocated from Administrative Services Economic Development Fund to state agencies. Modifies amounts allocated from Veterans' Services Fund. Modifies amounts allocated from Criminal Fine Account. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state financial administration; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-01HouseChapter 8, (2020 Laws): Effective date September 20, 2020.
2020-09-20HouseGovernor signed.
2020-08-24SenatePresident signed.
2020-08-13HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-08-10SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 6--Boles, Findley, Knopp, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 4--Boquist, Hansell, Heard, Olsen.
2020-08-10SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2020-08-10SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-08-10SenateReferred to The Second Special Session of 2020.
2020-08-10SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-08-10HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
2020-08-10HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed. Ayes, 33; Nays, 24--Barker, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Drazan, Evans, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, Moore-Green, Nearman, Neron, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Williams, Wilson, Witt, Zika; Excused, 3--Barreto, Mitchell, Power.
2020-08-10HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2020-08-10HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-08-10HouseWork Session held.
2020-08-10HouseReferred to The Second Special Session of 2020.
2020-08-10HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback