OR HB5100 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Chapter 95, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 23, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Chapter 95, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 23, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to state financial administration; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Chapter 95, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 23, 2010. | |
2010-03-23 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-04 | President signed. | |
2010-02-25 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-25 | Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed. Ayes, 22; nays, 5--Atkinson, Ferrioli, Kruse, Starr, Whitsett; excused, 3--Bates, George, Verger. | |
2010-02-24 | Rules suspended. Second reading. | |
2010-02-24 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2010-02-24 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2010-02-24 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Nathanson, Smith G., Stiegler. | |
2010-02-24 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Buckley. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 9--Bruun, Cameron, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Olson, Sprenger, Whisnant, Wingard; Excused, 1--Schaufler. | |
2010-02-24 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-22 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-18 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-17 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-17 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-16 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-12 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-10 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-09 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-05 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2010-02-03 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |