OR HB5042 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Chapter 365, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 18, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Limits biennial expenditures for certain purposes from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by State Treasurer. Limits biennial expenditures for certain purposes from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by State Treasurer. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the financial administration of the State Treasurer; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-26HouseChapter 365, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 18, 2023.
2023-07-18HouseGovernor signed.
2023-06-27SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-23SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Findley.
2023-06-23SenateThird reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 1--Smith DB; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher.
2023-06-22SenateCarried over to 06-23 by unanimous consent.
2023-06-21SenateSecond reading.
2023-06-21SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2023-06-16SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2023-06-15SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2023-06-07HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Chaichi. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Morgan; Excused, 1--Levy B.
2023-06-07HouseSecond reading.
2023-06-05HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2023-06-02HouseWork Session held.
2023-05-31HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2023-05-31HouseWork Session held.
2023-05-30HouseWork Session held.
2023-03-14HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-03-13HouseInformational Meeting held.
2023-02-02HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
2023-02-02HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2023-02-02HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB5042
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB5042/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB5042/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB5042/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB5042/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25152
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25186
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25227
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/73710
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264399
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275008
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275152
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80195
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275375
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275389
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80246
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80282
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80686
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35994
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=584882
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=589794

Bill Comments

feedback