OR HB5040 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Chapter 761, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Chapter 761, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Transportation for biennial expenses. Limits certain biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts and certain federal funds, but excluding lottery funds and other federal funds, collected or received by department. Limits certain biennial expenditures by department from other federal funds. Limits certain biennial expenditures by department from lottery moneys. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Increases certain limitations on expenditures of moneys collected or received by department for highway projects and other commitments in 2013-2015 biennium. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015] on passage.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Department of Transportation; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-28 | House | Chapter 761, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2015. |
2015-07-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Riley, Thatcher declared potential conflict of interest. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 19; nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-30 | House | Passed.Ayes, 40; Nays, 20--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whitsett, Wilson. |
2015-06-30 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith. |
2015-06-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. |
2015-06-29 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-06-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-15 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |