OR HB5034 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Chapter 669, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Chapter 669, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to State Parks and Recreation Department for certain biennial expenses.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the State Parks and Recreation Department; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | House | Chapter 669, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2013. |
2013-07-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Boquist, Close. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Motion to refer to Ways and Means carried on voice vote. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Taken from 06-28 Calendar and placed on 06-29 Calendar on voice vote. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Buckley. Passed. Ayes, 31; Nays, 27--Barton, Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hicks, Huffman, Jenson, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McKeown, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Hanna, Unger. |
2013-06-21 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-06-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-12 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |