OR HB5030 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 444, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 02, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 444, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 02, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Public Defense Services Commission for certain biennial expenses. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Public Defense Services Commission for certain biennial expenses. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by commission. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Emergency Board for allocation to commission during biennium. Modifies certain General Fund appropriation made to commission. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Public Defense Services Commission; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 444, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 02, 2021. |
2021-07-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 5--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-15 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Noble; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-15 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-06-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-09 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |