OR HB5026 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 668, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Human Services for certain biennial expenses. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts and certain federal funds, but excluding lottery funds and other federal funds, collected or received by department for certain purposes. Limits biennial expenditures by department from certain federal funds. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Appropriates moneys to Emergency Board for allocation to department. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the financial administration of the Department of Human Services; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-14HouseChapter 668, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019.
2019-08-09HouseGovernor signed.
2019-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2019-07-02HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-06-29SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist.
2019-06-29SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2019-06-29SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2019-06-29SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-06-29SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-06-24HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Findley, Nearman, Reschke, Smith DB; Excused, 1--Clem; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
2019-06-24HouseSecond reading.
2019-06-21HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-06-20HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-13HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-13HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-12HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-28HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-27HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-26HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-25HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-21HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-20HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-19HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-12HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-05HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-31HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-29HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-23HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2019-01-15HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-02-06HousePublic Hearing scheduled.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback