OR HB5023 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 125, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 125, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by Oregon Medical Board. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Oregon Medical Board; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 125, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2017. |
2017-05-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Steiner Hayward declared potential conflict of interest. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 4--Boquist, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Buehler. Passed.Ayes, 59; Nays, 1--Sprenger. |
2017-05-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-02 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-19 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-04-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |