OR HB5017 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 577, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 577, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Legislative Administration Committee, Legislative Assembly, Legislative Counsel Committee, Legislative Fiscal Officer, Legislative Revenue Officer, Commission on Indian Services and Legislative Policy and Research Committee for biennial expenses. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by certain legislative branch agencies. Authorizes specified nonlimited expenditures. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of legislative branch agencies; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Chapter 577, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2017. |
2017-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Knopp, Linthicum, Thatcher. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-07-05 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed.Ayes, 52; Nays, 5--Bentz, Buehler, Parrish, Post, Vial; Excused, 1--Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Barker, Smith DB. |
2017-07-05 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-07-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-29 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |