OR HB5016 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 218, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 218, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Education for State School Fund. Limits biennial expenditures from lottery moneys allocated from Administrative Services Economic Development Fund to department for State School Fund. Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by department for State School Fund. Specifies amounts department may spend for certain purposes from State School Fund. Specifies, for 2019 and 2020 fiscal years, total amount that department may spend from State School Fund. Transfers moneys from State School Fund to Local Option Equalization Grants Account. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 218, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2019. |
2019-06-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Boquist, Linthicum; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Carried over to 05-23 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-05-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 4--Barreto, Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 1--Helm. |
2019-05-09 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-05-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-01 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-05-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |