OR HB5005 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 661, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 661, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes amounts authorized for issuance of general obligation bonds, revenue bonds, certificates of participation and other financing agreements for biennium. Establishes amounts allocated for private activity bonds. Makes legislative findings regarding benefits to higher education institutions and community colleges from issuance of certain general obligation bonds under Article XI-F(1) and Article XI-G of Oregon Constitution]. Modifies law authorizing issuance of general obligation bonds for biennium ending June 30, 2019. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019] on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | House | Chapter 661, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019. |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Steiner Hayward. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Gelser, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 28; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 2--Nearman, Post; Excused, 4--Barreto, Clem, Hernandez, Reardon. |
2019-06-26 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith G. |
2019-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-06-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-25 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-24 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2019-05-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |