OR HB5003 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 453, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 453, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Approves certain new or increased fees adopted by State Department of Agriculture. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Chapter 453, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2019. |
2019-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Heard, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Carried over to 06-11 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-05-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 16--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Helt, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Zika; Excused, 1--Williams; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Boles, Prusak, Speaker Kotek, Williamson. |
2019-05-29 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-05-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-16 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-05-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |