OR HB4214 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Declares Oregon policy regarding Indian children. Modifies Oregon child welfare laws regarding Indian children to reconcile with provisions of federal Indian Child Welfare Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Indian children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30HouseGovernor signed.
2020-06-30SenatePresident signed.
2020-06-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 26; Excused, 4--Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2020-06-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2020-06-26SenateReferred to The First Special Session of 2020.
2020-06-26SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-06-26HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barker, Barreto, Clem.
2020-06-26HouseSecond reading.
2020-06-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2020-06-25HouseReferred to The First Special Session of 2020.
2020-06-25HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-06-25HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback