OR HB4213 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits during emergency period and grace period residential and commercial evictions for nonpayment during emergency period. Prohibits residential and commercial evictions under specified conditions during emergency period.] Tolls statute of limitations for claims for residential nonpayment during emergency period and grace period. Prohibits residential evictions without cause during emergency period. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to evictions; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30HouseGovernor signed.
2020-06-29SenatePresident signed.
2020-06-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-06-26SenateBaertschiger Jr, Burdick, Fagan, Girod, Golden, Hass, Monnes Anderson, Thatcher, Wagner declared potential conflict of interest.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Johnson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2020-06-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2020-06-26SenateReferred to The First Special Session of 2020.
2020-06-26SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-06-26HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
2020-06-26HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed. Ayes, 43; Nays, 14--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 3--Barker, Barreto, Clem.
2020-06-26HouseSecond reading.
2020-06-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2020-06-25HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-06-24HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-06-24HouseReferred to The First Special Session of 2020.
2020-06-24HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback