OR HB4212 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes governing bodies of public bodies, other than State of Oregon, to conduct all public meetings using telephone or video conferencing technology or through other electronic or virtual means. Requires public body, in cases in which governing body elects to conduct virtual public meeting, to supply means by which public can listen to or observe meeting. Provides exceptions. Modifies quorum requirements of local governing bodies to exclude members who are unable to attend because of illness due to COVID-19. Provides that recovery rebate payments made under Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act (CARES Act) and deposited in debtor's account in financial institution are not subject to garnishment. Provides exceptions. Applies to garnishments issued on or before date 90 days after expiration of state of emergency declared March 8, 2020, and any extension of declaration] September 30, 2020. Authorizes Chief Justice of Supreme Court, during emergency period and for 60 days thereafter, and upon finding of good cause, to extend or suspend time period or time requirement in rule or statute in specified court proceedings. Authorizes presiding judge of circuit court to extend custody and postpone trials upon finding of good cause, and within specified limits. Authorizes Chief Justice to direct or permit electronic court appearances. Extends time to commence civil action or give notice of civil claim if expiration of time falls within emergency period or within 90 days after end of emergency period. Sunsets authority of judicial officers to modify time periods and other procedures on December 31, 2021. Requires local governments to allow siting of qualifying emergency shelters by qualifying entities notwithstanding land use laws. Removes certain limits on motor vehicle camping. Sunsets 90 days after taking effect. Directs Housing and Community Services Department to distribute fund moneys so as to provide energy bill payment assistance to low-income households, prioritizing low-income households affected by pandemic.] Temporarily allows notary public to perform notarial act using communication technology for remotely located individual under certain circumstances. Immunizes owner, officer, operator, employee or agent of isolation shelter, or public entity, from civil liability that is predicated on claim of illness, injury or death from COVID-19. Exempts from immunity conduct that constitutes gross negligence, malice or fraud, that is willful, intentional or reckless, that is criminal or that is unrelated to COVID-19.] Delays termination of enterprise zone that would otherwise terminate on June 30, 2020, to December 31, 2020. Authorizes redesignation of enterprise zone that terminates on December 31, 2020, on any date before January 1, 2021. Allows individual development accounts to be established for emergency savings. Requires Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services to adopt temporary and permanent rules establishing emergency temporary infectious disease standards.] Directs Oregon Health Authority to adopt rules regarding race and ethnicity data collection by health care providers. Allows physician assistant to perform services and provide patient care without first entering into practice agreement, subject to limitations, and streamlines certain requirements during emergency period. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to strategies to protect Oregonians from the effects of the COVID-19 pandemic; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30HouseGovernor signed.
2020-06-30SenatePresident signed.
2020-06-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 4--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard; Excused, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2020-06-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2020-06-26SenateReferred to The First Special Session of 2020.
2020-06-26SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-06-26HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 47; Nays, 10--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Drazan, Hayden, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Wallan; Excused, 3--Barker, Barreto, Clem.
2020-06-26HouseSecond reading.
2020-06-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2020-06-25HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-06-24HouseReferred to The First Special Session of 2020.
2020-06-24HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback