OR HB4211 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Chapter 11, (2020 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifies timing of when Department of Education is required to make transfers from Fund for Student Success. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Fund for Student Success; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-07HouseChapter 11, (2020 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2020.
2020-06-30HouseGovernor signed.
2020-06-30SenatePresident signed.
2020-06-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2020-06-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-06-26SenateReferred to The First Special Session of 2020.
2020-06-26SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-06-25HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 5--Drazan, Nearman, Owens, Reschke, Wallan; Excused, 3--Barker, Barreto, Boshart Davis.
2020-06-25HouseSecond reading.
2020-06-24HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-06-24HouseWork Session held.
2020-06-24HouseReferred to The First Special Session of 2020.
2020-06-24HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback