OR HB4209 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Chapter 9, (2020 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allows Eastern Oregon Border Economic Development Board to enter into agreement with third-party administrator to operate programs for awarding grants and making loans that enhance and expand workforce development and economic development in Eastern Oregon Border Economic Development Region. Allows Eastern Oregon Border Economic Development Board to enter into agreement with third-party administrator to operate programs for awarding grants and making loans that enhance and expand workforce development and economic development in Eastern Oregon Border Economic Development Region. Requires that board submit proposed agreement to Oregon Business Development Department for review. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to awarding moneys through programs in the eastern Oregon border region; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-07HouseChapter 9, (2020 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2020.
2020-06-30HouseGovernor signed.
2020-06-30SenatePresident signed.
2020-06-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2020-06-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-06-26SenateReferred to The First Special Session of 2020.
2020-06-26SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-06-25HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Owens. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Barker, Barreto, Boshart Davis, Holvey.
2020-06-25HouseSecond reading.
2020-06-24HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-06-24HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-06-24HouseReferred to The First Special Session of 2020.
2020-06-24HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback