OR HB4203 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-2)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Chapter 3, (2020 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that peace officer may not use force that impedes normal breathing or circulation of blood of another person by applying pressure on throat or neck, unless peace officer may use deadly physical force. Provides that peace officer may not use force that limits ability of person to breathe, including but not limited to choke holds] impedes normal breathing or circulation of blood of another person by applying pressure on throat or neck, unless peace officer may use deadly physical force. Directs Board on Public Safety Standards and Training to adopt rules prohibiting training of police officers and reserve officers to use force that impedes normal breathing or circulation of blood of another person by applying pressure on throat or neck, except as defensive maneuver. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to use of force by peace officers; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-07HouseChapter 3, (2020 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2020.
2020-06-30HouseGovernor signed.
2020-06-30SenatePresident signed.
2020-06-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 1--Boquist; Excused, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen.
2020-06-26SenateRules Suspended. Second reading.
2020-06-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2020-06-26SenateReferred to The First Special Session of 2020.
2020-06-26SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-06-26HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Breese-Iverson, Leif, Smith DB, Wallan, Williams.
2020-06-26HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 5--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Nearman, Reschke, Smith G; Excused, 3--Barker, Barreto, Clem.
2020-06-26HouseSecond reading.
2020-06-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2020-06-25HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-06-24HouseReferred to The First Special Session of 2020.
2020-06-24HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback