OR HB4166 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Oregon Department of Administrative Services to contract for independent economist to perform work related to wildfire protection and wildfire suppression cost and funding source information for lands protected by State Forestry Department. Provides for appointment of project team or technical advisory group to assist economist. Requires completion of work and report of findings and recommendations no later than March 1, 2021. Appropriates moneys to Oregon Department of Administrative Services for biennium ending June 30, 2021, for purpose of carrying out contracting and oversight. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to an analysis of wildfire economics on lands protected by the State Forestry Department; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-03-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2020-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-27 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2020-02-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2020-02-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2020-02-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |