OR HB4164 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Chapter 46, (2024 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

The Act makes changes to a survey on sexual misconduct at colleges. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.7). [Removes the condition on reimbursement for expenses for nonlegislative members of the Sexual Misconduct Survey Council. Permits the council to distribute a sexual misconduct survey developed under federal law in lieu of the survey required under state law. Prohibits the data for an institution of higher education that contains 10 or fewer reports of sexual misconduct from being made available to the public.] Changes the exceptions for an institution of higher education employing at least one certified advocate for victim services. Limits the duration of the waiver to meet the requirements in a memorandum of understanding with a community-based domestic and sexual violence advocacy agency that may be issued to an institution of higher education. Limits the individuals who may issue a waiver from certain institution-sponsored programs or activities to students. Adds required data to the report on sexual misconduct submitted by each institution of higher education annually. Requires the delivery of the base survey by the council to institutions of higher education by the beginning of the 2025-2026 academic year. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to sexual misconduct at institutions of higher education; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-28HouseChapter 46, (2024 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2024.
2024-03-27HouseGovernor signed.
2024-03-07SenatePresident signed.
2024-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2024-03-05SenateThird reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Boquist, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 1--Woods.
2024-03-04SenateCarried over to 03-05 by unanimous consent.
2024-03-01SenateCarried over to 03-04 by unanimous consent.
2024-02-29SenateSecond reading.
2024-02-29SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2024-02-27SenateWork Session held.
2024-02-22SenatePublic Hearing held.
2024-02-21SenateReferred to Education.
2024-02-21SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2024-02-21HouseThird reading. Carried by Hartman. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 1--Yunker; Excused, 6--Boshart Davis, Bynum, Levy E, Marsh, Pham K, Ruiz.
2024-02-20HouseRules suspended. Carried over to February 21, 2024 Calendar.
2024-02-20HouseSecond reading.
2024-02-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2024-02-15HouseWork Session held.
2024-02-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2024-02-05HouseReferred to Higher Education.
2024-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Measures/Overview/HB4164
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4164/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4164/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4164/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4164/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25607
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25926
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/81376
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/280524
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/280720
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/281140
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/281585
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/81840
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/81844
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/81975
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/281834
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/281835
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/82133
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/282363
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/282559
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/282914
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/82342
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36848
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=608899
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36933
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=610384

Bill Comments

feedback