OR HB4161 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Defines "Regional Health Equity Coalition" and "Regional Health Equity Coalition model." Requires Oregon Health Authority to work with Regional Health Equity Coalitions and groups utilizing Regional Health Equity Coalition model throughout state. Defines "Regional Health Equity Coalition" and "Regional Health Equity Coalition model." Requires Oregon Health Authority to provide grants to] work with Regional Health Equity Coalitions and groups utilizing Regional Health Equity Coalition model throughout state. Appropriates moneys to fund additional grants for organizations seeking to build Regional Health Equity Coalitions.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to disparities in health outcomes for communities impacted by discrimination; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08SenateAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-21HouseThird reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 13--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Drazan, Leif, Lewis, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger; Excused, 5--Clem, Greenlick, Hayden, Stark, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Holvey, Rayfield, Smith G, Speaker Kotek.
2020-02-20HouseCarried over to February 21, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-19HouseSecond reading.
2020-02-18HouseSubsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
2020-02-18HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
2020-02-13HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback